EP4301378 - CELL CULTURE GROWTH APPARATUS AND METHOD OF UNDERSIDE ATTACHMENT TO A SURFACE USING CELL SEEDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgia Tech Research Corporation 926 Dalney Street, NW Atlanta, GA 30318 / US | For all designated states Children's Healthcare of Atlanta, Inc. 1575 Northeast Expressway Atlanta, GA 30329 / US | For all designated states Emory University 1599 Clifton Road N.E. Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIOLA, Hannah Atlanta, GA 30318 / US | 02 /
GRUNWELL, Jocelyn, R. Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | 03 /
TAKAYAMA, Shuichi NW Atlanta, GA 30318 / US | 04 /
TIROUVANZIAM, Rabindra Atlanta, GA 30329 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22764102.4 | 03.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022US18810 | Priority number, date | US202163156068P | 03.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163156068 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022187563 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301378 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/12, G01N33/50, A61K35/36 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/5088 (EP);
G01N33/5029 (EP,US);
C12M23/12 (EP,US);
C12M33/02 (EP);
C12N5/0018 (US);
C12N5/0688 (EP,US);
G01N33/5044 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (EP);
C12N2500/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | ZELLKULTURWACHSTUMSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSEITIGEN BEFESTIGUNG AN EINER OBERFLÄCHE MITTELS ZELLENAUSSAAT | [2024/02] | English: | CELL CULTURE GROWTH APPARATUS AND METHOD OF UNDERSIDE ATTACHMENT TO A SURFACE USING CELL SEEDING | [2024/02] | French: | APPAREIL DE CROISSANCE DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION PAR-DESSOUS À UNE SURFACE À L'AIDE D'UN ENSEMENCEMENT CELLULAIRE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 25.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4061466 (SJOHOLM INGVAR GOSTA HOLGER, et al) [A] 1,7 * col 7 para 1, col 10 para 5 *; | [Y]US2011293666 (WANG XIANYAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 7-9 * para [0039], [0066], [0068], [0080], [0082], [0086], [0089], [0095], [0099], [0118], [0147], [0150], [0265], [0269], [0287], [0304] *; | [Y]US2013017592 (PIND PETER FRODE [DK], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-9 * para [0025], [0032], Claim 1, Abstract *; | [A]US2020246797 (KIM MIN SEOK [KR]) [A] 1,7* para [0091] * |