EP4301286 - STABLENEC STANDALONE INTERBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexus Spine, LLC 13867 South Bangerter Parkway Ste. 150 Draper, Utah 84020 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALVERSON, Peter A. Draper, Utah 84020 / US | 02 /
HAWKES, David T. Draper, Utah 84020 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22764203.0 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022US19044 | Priority number, date | US202163156825P | 04.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163156825 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022187718 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301286 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44, A61F2/30 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
B33Y80/00 (EP);
A61F2/30749 (EP);
A61F2/4425 (EP);
A61F2002/30011 (EP);
A61F2002/30014 (EP);
A61F2002/30281 (EP);
A61F2002/30383 (EP);
A61F2002/30571 (EP);
A61F2002/30576 (EP);
A61F2002/30578 (EP);
A61F2002/3092 (EP);
A61F2002/3093 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | EIGENSTÄNDIGER STABILER ZWISCHENKÖRPER | [2024/02] | English: | STABLENEC STANDALONE INTERBODY | [2024/02] | French: | IMPLANTS STABLENEC INTERSOMATIQUES AUTONOMES | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008161927 (SAVAGE HEATHER [US], et al) [Y] 10, 19 * , entire document, especially Fig. 3; para [0077]-[0079] *; | [XY]US2010152856 (OVERES THOMAS [CH], et al) [X] 1, 6-9, 11-18, 20 * , entire document, especially Fig. 6A-6D; para [0040], [0041], [0043], [0044], [0050] * [Y] 10, 19; | [X]US2015328005 (PADOVANI NICK [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * , entire document, especially Fig. 4A, 4B, 13A, 13C; para [0114]-[0117], [0153], [0154], [0157], [0170] *; | [Y]US2017172755 (SUH JON [US], et al) [Y] 10, 19 * , entire document, especially Fig. 6A, 6D; para [0067] *; | [A]US2019274841 (HAWKES DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2019343644 (RYAN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document * |