EP4384032 - ELECTRONIC SMOKING DEVICE WITH A BATTERY HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LICKEFELD, Daniel 54340 Riol / DE | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/25] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22764734.4 | 11.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022EP72599 | Priority number, date | EP20210191236 | 13.08.2021 Original published format: EP 21191236 | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2023017131 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4384032 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, H01M50/247, H01M4/133, H01M4/1393, H01M4/587, H01M10/04, H01M10/0525, H01M10/058, H01M50/107 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP);
H01M10/0422 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M10/058 (EP);
H01M4/133 (EP);
H01M4/1393 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE RAUCHVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM BATTERIEGEHÄUSE | [2024/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC SMOKING DEVICE WITH A BATTERY HOUSING | [2024/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF À FUMER ÉLECTRONIQUE DOTÉ D'UN BOÎTIER DE BATTERIE | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 11.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012173111 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [XYI]WO2016096865 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); | [XI]EP3541214 (RAI STRATEGIC HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [XI]US2020060341 (SEBASTIAN ANDRIES [US], et al); | [YA]US2020154784 (SEBASTIAN ANDRIES D [US], et al); | [XI]US2021186117 (LIU TUANFANG [CN]); | [XI]WO2021142196 (JUUL LABS INC [US]); |