EP4388530 - AUDIO ENCODER, METHOD FOR PROVIDING AN ENCODED REPRESENTATION OF AN AUDIO INFORMATION, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND ENCODED AUDIO REPRESENTATION USING IMMEDIATE PLAYOUT FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUENDORF, Max 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
RETTELBACH, Nikolaus 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
MITTAG, Christina 91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
RICHTER, Daniel 91058 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
DENIAU, Agathe 91058 Erlangen / DE | 06 /
ASLAM, Wahaj 91058 Erlangen / DE | 07 /
HOFMANN, Ingo 91058 Erlangen / DE | 08 /
HERRMANN, Bernd 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Burger, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22764807.8 | 18.08.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022EP73073 | Priority number, date | EP20210192257 | 19.08.2021 Original published format: EP 21192257 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023021137 | Date: | 23.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4388530 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/16 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G10L19/167 (EP);
G10L19/002 (US);
G10L19/032 (US);
G10L19/12 (US);
G10L2019/0001 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOCODIERER, VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER CODIERTEN DARSTELLUNG EINER AUDIOINFORMATION, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND CODIERTE AUDIODARSTELLUNG MIT SOFORTWIEDERGABERAHMEN | [2024/26] | English: | AUDIO ENCODER, METHOD FOR PROVIDING AN ENCODED REPRESENTATION OF AN AUDIO INFORMATION, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND ENCODED AUDIO REPRESENTATION USING IMMEDIATE PLAYOUT FRAMES | [2024/26] | French: | CODEUR AUDIO, PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UNE REPRÉSENTATION CODÉE D'UNE INFORMATION AUDIO, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET REPRÉSENTATION AUDIO CODÉE À L'AIDE DE TRAMES DE LECTURE IMMÉDIATE | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 15.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2863386 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [XAI]WO2018130577 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [XAI]WO2020038938 (DOLBY INT AB [NL]) |