EP4387452 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING PESTS ON TEA PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Crop Protection AG Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNADA, Takatsune Ushiku-shi Ibaraki, 300--1288 / JP | 02 /
YANAGIDA, Yuichi Tokyo, 104--6021 / JP | 03 /
OGASAWARA, Hiromi Ushiku-shi Ibaraki, 300--1288 / JP | 04 /
MORIMOTO, Teruichi Shimada-shi Shizuoka, 472--0032 / JP | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22765559.4 | 18.08.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022EP73069 | Priority number, date | EP20210192374 | 20.08.2021 Original published format: EP 21192374 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023021136 | Date: | 23.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4387452 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/06, A01P7/04 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
A01P7/04 (EP);
A01N47/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON SCHÄDLINGEN AUF TEEPFLANZEN | [2024/26] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING PESTS ON TEA PLANTS | [2024/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CONTRE LES NUISIBLES SUR DES THÉIERS | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 20.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | EP0528156 | WO9805638 | WO2004007448 | WO2006089633 | WO2010066780 | WO2018114648 | WO2018114649 | WO2020208098 |