EP4280438 - VOICE COIL MOTOR, CAMERA, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Weicheng Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22766086.7 | 19.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022CN72697 | Priority number, date | CN202110252510 | 08.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110252510 | [2023/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022188559 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280438 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/035, G02B7/08, G03B13/36, G03B5/00, G02B27/64, G03B3/10, G03B30/00 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
H02K41/0356 (EP,CN);
H02K41/02 (CN);
G03B13/36 (CN,US);
G02B27/646 (EP);
G02B7/08 (EP);
G02B7/09 (CN);
G03B3/10 (EP);
G03B30/00 (EP);
G03B5/00 (EP,CN);
H02K11/225 (US);
H02K41/0354 (US);
H04N23/687 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | H02K41/02, G02B7/09, G03B13/36, G03B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | SCHWINGSPULENMOTOR, KAMERA UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/47] | English: | VOICE COIL MOTOR, CAMERA, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/47] | French: | MOTEUR À BOBINE ACOUSTIQUE, CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2023 | Translation filed | 14.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN201402344Y (DONGGUAN YINGJU ELECTRON SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN102820759 (HONGFUJIN PREC IND SHENZHEN, et al); | [A]CN104079138 (SILITECH TECHNOLOGY CO, et al); | [X]CN107247382 (HENAN HAOZE ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]CN107277338 (HENAN HAOZE ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]CN207676095U (HENAN HOZEL ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]CN108377087 (SUZHOU FORCECON ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]CN108490579 (SUZHOU FORCECON ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [PX]CN113037045 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) |