EP4305962 - ANTIVIRAL AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOBO CO., LTD. 13-1, Umeda 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAHARA, Akio Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914-8550 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Shuhei Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22766778.9 | 18.02.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022JP06587 | Priority number, date | JP20210036197 | 08.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021036197 | JP20210153308 | 21.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021153308 | [2024/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022190815 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4305962 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/16, A01P1/00, A61K8/60, A61K31/7028, A61K31/7032, A61L2/16, A61L2/18, A61L2/23, A61P31/12, A61P31/14, A61P31/16, A61P31/22, A61Q5/02, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10, C11D1/68 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A01P1/00 (EP);
A61K31/7032 (EP,US);
A01N43/16 (EP);
A61K8/602 (US);
A61P31/16 (US);
A61Q17/005 (US);
A61Q19/10 (US);
C11D1/662 (EP);
C11D3/48 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/16, A01N25/02, A01N25/04, A01N25/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | ANTIVIRALES MITTEL | [2024/03] | English: | ANTIVIRAL AGENT | [2024/03] | French: | AGENT ANTIVIRAL | [2024/03] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2024/03: A request for correction of the description has been filed pursuant to Rule 139 EPC. A decision on the request will be taken during the proceedings before the examining division (Guidelines for Examination in the EPO, A-V, 3). | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2023 | Translation filed | 05.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008127409 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-18 * claims *; | [A] - van Bogaert, Inge; Soetaert, Wim, "Tailor-made biosurfactants through metabolic engineering", SPECIALITY CHEMICALS., REDHILL, GB, GB , (20140101), vol. 34, no. 1, ISSN 0262-2262, pages 33 - 34, XP009539703 [A] 1-18 * page 33 * | [A] - Dai KITAMOTO, "Naturally Engineered Glycolipid Biosurfactants Leading to Distinctive Self-assembling Properties", Yakugaku zasshi : Journal of the Pharmaceutical Society of Japan, Pharmaceutical Society of Japan, (20080501), vol. 128, no. 5, doi:10.1248/yakushi.128.695, ISSN 0031-6903, pages 695 - 706, XP009539497 [A] 1-18 * abstract of the dissertation * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/yakushi.128.695 | [A] - Takahashi, Daisuke; Toshima, Kazunobu, "Efficient Total Synthesis of Mannosylerythritol Lipids (MELs) and Evaluation of Their Antibacterial Activity", Oreo-saisensu : journal of Japan Oil Chemists' Society, Japan Oil Chemists' Society, JP, JP , (20200101), vol. 20, no. 5, doi:10.5650/oleoscience.20.209, ISSN 1345-8949, pages 209 - 214, XP009539701 [A] 1-18 * abstract part * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5650/oleoscience.20.209 | [A] - Zhang Jun; Sun Yihua; Wang Wei; Zhang Xiaoshuang; Li Chunxia; Guan Huashi, "Synthesis and antiviral evaluation of 6′-acylamido-6′-deoxy-α-d-mannog", Carbohydrate Research, PERGAMON, GB, GB , (20130823), vol. 381, doi:10.1016/j.carres.2013.08.010, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 74 - 82, XP028756582 [A] 1-18 * abstract, table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2013.08.010 | by applicant | - Journal of Bioscience and Bioengineering, (20020000), vol. 94, page 187 | - Biologicals, (19970000), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 289 - 297 |