EP4307846 - LOW-ROUGHNESS SURFACE-TREATED COPPER FOIL WITH LOW BENDING DEFORMATION, COPPER CLAD LAMINATE COMPRISING SAME, AND PRINTED WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOTTE ENERGY MATERIALS CORPORATION 63-25 Seogam-ro 3-gil Iksan-si, Jeollabuk-do 54586 / KR | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Chang Yol Iksan-si Jeollabuk-do 54586 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Jung Woo Iksan-si Jeollabuk-do 54586 / KR | 03 /
SONG, Kideok Iksan-si Jeollabuk-do 54586 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sunhyoung Iksan-si Jeollabuk-do 54586 / KR | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte PartG mbB Tilsiter Straße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22767299.5 | 11.01.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022KR00439 | Priority number, date | KR20210032133 | 11.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210032133 | [2024/03] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022191402 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4307846 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/38, H05K1/09, B32B15/08, B32B15/20 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H05K3/384 (EP);
H05K3/381 (KR);
H05K3/38 (US);
B32B15/08 (KR);
B32B15/085 (EP);
B32B15/14 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP,KR);
C25D3/38 (US);
C25D5/48 (US);
C25D9/04 (US);
H05K1/032 (US);
H05K1/09 (EP,KR);
H05K3/188 (US);
B32B2307/538 (EP);
B32B2457/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTE KUPFERFOLIE MIT GERINGER RAUHIGKEIT UND GERINGER BIEGEVERFORMUNG, KUPFERKASCHIERTES LAMINAT DAMIT UND LEITERPLATTE | [2024/03] | English: | LOW-ROUGHNESS SURFACE-TREATED COPPER FOIL WITH LOW BENDING DEFORMATION, COPPER CLAD LAMINATE COMPRISING SAME, AND PRINTED WIRING BOARD | [2024/03] | French: | FEUILLE DE CUIVRE TRAITÉE EN SURFACE À FAIBLE RUGOSITÉ AYANT UNE FAIBLE DÉFORMATION À LA FLEXION, STRATIFIÉ PLAQUÉ DE CUIVRE LA COMPRENANT, ET CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2023 | Translation filed | 11.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009136725 (SHIMOKAWA HIROTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0045]-[0073]; claims 1-10; and figures 1-3. *; | [A]WO2010110092 (NIPPON MINING CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0079]; claims 1-7; and figures 1-9. *; | [A]KR20130132111 (ILJIN MATERIALS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0071]; claims 1-20; and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2016149438 (FUKUDA METAL FOIL & POWDER CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0117]; claims 1-8; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20190135878 (KCF TECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0135]; claims 1-15; and figures 1-7. * | by applicant | US6194056 |