EP4391947 - SYSTEM FOR GUIDING AN OSTEOTOMY PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ostesys 75 Avenue Gabriel Péri 38400 Saint-Martin-D'Hères / FR | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONTAINE, Sylvain 38400 SAINT-MARTIN-D'HÈRES / FR | 02 /
LONJARET, Thomas 38400 SAINT-MARTIN-D'HÈRES / FR | 03 /
CHANRION, Marie-Anne 38400 SAINT-MARTIN-D'HÈRES / FR | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22768778.7 | 23.08.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022EP73489 | Priority number, date | EP20210306136 | 23.08.2021 Original published format: EP 21306136 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023025807 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4391947 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, A61B34/10, A61B90/00 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP);
A61B2034/105 (EP);
A61B2034/2048 (EP);
A61B2034/2051 (EP);
A61B2034/2055 (EP);
A61B2034/2068 (EP);
A61B2090/376 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR FÜHRUNG EINES OSTEOTOMIEVERFAHRENS | [2024/27] | English: | SYSTEM FOR GUIDING AN OSTEOTOMY PROCEDURE | [2024/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE D'UNE PROCÉDURE D'OSTÉOTOMIE | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 08.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2002198451 (CARSON CHRISTOPHER P [US]); | [XA]US2004106926 (LEITNER FRANCOIS [FR], et al); |