Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4308065 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP22770790 IN2022050251W US202218281925



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024165000Global Dossier 23.05.2024A1
Priority number Date
IN202121011541 18.03.2021
WO2022IN50251 16.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4308065Global Dossier 24.01.2024A1
Priority number Date
IN202121011541 18.03.2021
WO2022IN50251 16.03.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022195624Global Dossier 22.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
IN202121011541 18.03.2021