EP4308164 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ALFAXALONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Respect Labs LLP A-707, TTC Industrial Area, MIDC, Mahape Nr. Ramnath Solar Bus Stop, Navi Mumabi Maharashtra 400710 / IN | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Kodali Eswara Mumbai Maharashtra 400710 / IN | 02 /
SIVAKUMAR, Bobba Venkata Mumbai Maharashtra 400710 / IN | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22770793.2 | 16.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022IN50254 | Priority number, date | IN202121011214 | 16.03.2021 Original published format: IN202121011214 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022195627 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4308164 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/02, A61K31/573 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C07J7/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALFAXALON | [2024/04] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ALFAXALONE | [2024/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ALFAXALONE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3504087 (IRMSCHER KLAUS, et al); |