EP4275810 - DAMAGE EVALULATION DEVICE AND DAMAGE EVALULATION METHOD FOR PRESS-FORMING DIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAKE, Hiroto Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22771139.7 | 04.03.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022JP09295 | Priority number, date | JP20210042002 | 16.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021042002 | [2023/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022196385 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275810 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/20, B21D37/01, B21D37/04, B21D35/00, B21D37/08, B21D37/20, B21D28/26, B21D28/10, // B21D55/00, B30B15/28, G01N3/56, B21D24/16 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
B21D28/26 (EP);
B21D37/04 (EP,KR);
B30B15/28 (US);
B21D22/20 (EP);
B21D22/26 (KR);
B21D24/16 (EP,KR);
B21D28/10 (EP);
B21D35/001 (EP);
B21D37/01 (EP);
B21D37/08 (EP);
B21D37/20 (EP);
B30B11/005 (EP);
B30B11/022 (EP);
B30B15/02 (KR,US);
B30B15/064 (EP);
B30B15/34 (EP);
B30B9/28 (US);
G01M99/008 (EP);
B21D55/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | B21D37/00, B21D22/20, B21D22/26, B21D37/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEWERTUNG VON SCHÄDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG VON SCHÄDEN FÜR PRESSFORMWERKZEUGE | [2023/46] | English: | DAMAGE EVALULATION DEVICE AND DAMAGE EVALULATION METHOD FOR PRESS-FORMING DIES | [2023/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION D'ENDOMMAGEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION D'ENDOMMAGEMENT POUR MATRICES DE FORMAGE À LA PRESSE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2023 | Translation filed | 07.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 23.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005305510 (SUMITOMO METAL IND, et al); | [A]US2008229893 (SHEPARD CHRISTON L [US], et al); | [A]JP2020082190 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [A]WO2020183882 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH0721216U ; | [A]JP2010167437 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]JP4677804B ; | [A]JP4737606B ; | [A]JP2011189419 (HITACHI METALS LTD, et al); | [A]JP5135479B ; | [Y]JP2015048651 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2018164936 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [Y]KR20210000480 (KOREA INST IND TECH [KR]) | by applicant | JP2010167437 | JP4677804B | JP4737606B | JP2011189419 | JP5135479B |