EP4310556 - FILM AND PHOTOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARA Yuki Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 02 /
ARAYAMA Kyohei Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22771345.0 | 14.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022JP11156 | Priority number, date | JP20210045338 | 19.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021045338 | [2024/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022196599 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310556 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/02, G01J1/04 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G02B5/0278 (EP);
G01J1/0228 (EP);
G01J1/0242 (EP);
G01J1/48 (EP);
G02B5/0236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | FILM UND LICHTSENSOR | [2024/04] | English: | FILM AND PHOTOSENSOR | [2024/04] | French: | FILM ET PHOTOCAPTEUR | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2023 | Translation filed | 16.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07114013 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2002221608 (DAICEL CHEM, et al); | [Y]JP2007192861 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2012083741 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [Y]JP2013107787 (CANON KK); | [Y]WO2020262270 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | [Y]WO2020262271 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | [PA]WO2021199748 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPS4841708B | JPS5137193 | JPS5617654B | JPS5849860B | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | JPS63260909 | JPS63277653 | JPH01105238 | JPH0216765B | JPH0232293B | JPH0336081B | JP2000066385 | JP2000080068 | JP2001233842 | JP2003185831 | JP2003262716 | JP2003261827 | JP2004534797 | JP2006169325 | JP2006342166 | JP2008292970 | JP4223071B | JP2009145395 | JP2009217221 | JP2009242604 | JP2009288705 | JP2009288703 | JP2010032698 | JP2010106268 | JP2010164965 | JP2010527339 | JP2010262028 | US2011124824 | JP2011132503 | JP2011524436 | JP2011221494 | JP2012014052 | JP2012126830 | JP2012137564 | JP2012208494 | JP2012208374 | JP2013029760 | JP2013043962 | JP2013064993 | JP2013068814 | JP2013114249 | WO2013083505 | JP2013522445 | JP2013164471 | JP2013190459 | WO2013167515 | JP2013253224 | JP2014500852 | WO2014017669 | JP2014041318 | JP2014130173 | JP2014137466 | JP2014177613 | WO2015004565 | JP2015034961 | WO2015036910 | JP2015067794 | JP2015117327 | WO2015152153 | WO2015166779 | WO2016034963 | JP2016161859 | JP2016162946 | KR20160109444 | JP2016532675 | WO2016181987 | JP6031807B | JP2016216602 | JP6057891B | JP6065596B | JP2017019766 | WO2017033680 | JP2017048367 | WO2017051680 | JP2017523465 | JP2017151342 | JP2017167399 | WO2017164127 | JP2017194662 | JP2017198865 | KR20170122130 | JP6268967B | JP6301489B | WO2018110179 | WO2018163668 | WO2018221177 | JP6469669B | JP2019043864 | JP2019044030 | WO2019088055 | JP2019167313 | JP2020008634 | JP2020055992 | WO2020084854 | WO2020137819 |