EP4311302 - MULTI-LINK DEVICE OPERATING IN MULTIPLE LINKS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING MULTI-LINK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilus Institute of Standards and Technology Inc. 5Fl., 216 Hwangsaeul-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13595 / KR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sanghyun Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13595 / KR | 02 /
KO, Geonjung Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13595 / KR | 03 /
SON, Juhyung Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13595 / KR | 04 /
KWAK, Jinsam Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13595 / KR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22771771.7 | 16.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022KR03704 | Priority number, date | KR20210034964 | 17.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210034964 | KR20210036273 | 19.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210036273 | KR20210038379 | 24.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210038379 | [2024/04] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022197105 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4311302 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/16, H04W76/11, H04W76/15, H04W76/30, H04W84/12, H04W28/18, H04W72/04, H04W52/02 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
H04W74/004 (EP);
H04W28/16 (KR);
H04W76/15 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W52/0219 (EP);
H04W52/0225 (KR);
H04W52/0235 (EP);
H04W76/11 (KR);
H04W76/30 (KR);
H04W76/34 (US);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/28 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/04] | H04W28/16, H04W76/11, H04W76/15, H04W76/30, H04W84/12, H04W28/18, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | IN MEHREREN VERBINDUNGEN BETRIEBENE MULTILINK-VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER MULTILINK-VORRICHTUNG | [2024/04] | English: | MULTI-LINK DEVICE OPERATING IN MULTIPLE LINKS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING MULTI-LINK DEVICE | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF À LIAISONS MULTIPLES FONCTIONNANT DANS DE MULTIPLES LIAISONS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF À LIAISONS MULTIPLES | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2023 | Translation filed | 16.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2021004382 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [E]US2022132610 (GUO YUCHEN [CN], et al); | International search | [Y]US2019268846 (XIAO YONGCHUN [US], et al); |