EP4308700 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR TREATING BIOMASS FOR ON-SITE PRODUCTION OF CELLULOLYTIC ENZYMES AND METHOD OF USING THE ENZYMES TO MANUFACTURE FUELS AND CHEMICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auburn University 570 Devall Drive Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US | For all designated states Purevision Technology LLC 511 McKinley Ave. Fort Lupton, CO 80621 / US | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHRBURGER, Edwin R. Fort Lupton, Colorado 80621 / US | 02 /
LASKAR, Dhrubojyoti D. Fort Lupton, Colorado 80621 / US | 03 /
JIANG, Zhihua Auburn, Alabama 36830 / US | 04 /
LI, Jing Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US | 05 /
CULLINAN, Harry Opelika, Alabama 36801 / US | 06 /
LEE, Yoon Y. Auburn, Alabama 36830 / US | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22772227.9 | 17.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022US20800 | Priority number, date | US202163162623P | 18.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163162623 P | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022197957 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4308700 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/42, C12P19/14, C12P19/02, C12P7/56, C12R1/885, C07H1/08, C08H8/00, C13K13/00, D21C3/24, D21C7/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C08B37/0057 (EP,US);
C12P19/14 (EP,AU,US);
C12P7/10 (EP,US);
C07H1/08 (AU);
C08H8/00 (EP,AU,US);
C12N9/2437 (AU);
C12P19/02 (EP,AU,US);
C12P21/00 (EP);
C12P39/00 (EP);
C12P7/56 (EP,AU);
C12Y302/01004 (AU);
C13K1/02 (EP,US);
C13K13/002 (AU,US);
D21C7/00 (AU);
B01D11/00 (AU);
B01D2011/002 (AU);
C12P2201/00 (EP,US);
C12P2203/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BIOMASSE ZUR VOR-ORT-HERSTELLUNG ZELLULOLYTISCHER ENZYME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DER ENZYME ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRENNSTOFFEN UND CHEMIKALIEN | [2024/04] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR TREATING BIOMASS FOR ON-SITE PRODUCTION OF CELLULOLYTIC ENZYMES AND METHOD OF USING THE ENZYMES TO MANUFACTURE FUELS AND CHEMICALS | [2024/04] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE BIOMASSE POUR LA PRODUCTION SUR SITE D'ENZYMES CELLULOLYTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DES ENZYMES POUR FABRIQUER DES CARBURANTS ET DES PRODUITS CHIMIQUES | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017247730 (BROWN KIMBERLY [US], et al); | [X]WO2019010576 (HONEST INC [CA]) |