EP4308174 - METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR TREATING PROPIONIC ACIDEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55905 / US | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRY, Michael, A. Rochester, Minnesota 55901-7421 / US | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22772309.5 | 18.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022US21003 | Priority number, date | US202163163198P | 19.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163163198 P | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022198079 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4308174 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N9/00, C12N15/864 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C12N9/00 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61K48/0058 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (US);
C07K14/47 (US);
C12N9/93 (US);
A01K2217/075 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/0306 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US);
C12Y604/01003 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROPIONISCHER AZIDÄMIE | [2024/04] | English: | METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR TREATING PROPIONIC ACIDEMIA | [2024/04] | French: | MÉTHODES ET MATÉRIAUX POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ACIDÉMIE PROPIONIQUE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2018140688 (KRAUS JAN P [US]); | [XY]WO2020072451 (ULTRAGENYX PHARMACEUTICAL INC [US]); | [XY]US2021077553 (HORDEAUX JULIETTE [US], et al); | [PX]WO2021067598 (ULTRAGENYX PHARMACEUTICAL INC [US]) |