EP4396472 - PLATE FOR JOINING TWO END PORTIONS OF A CONVEYOR BELT, PROVIDED WITH A SHEATH, JOINING DEVICE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH JOINING PLATE, AND ASSOCIATED STRIP OF JOINING PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FP Business Invest Rue Michel Rondet ZI du Clos Marquet 42400 Saint-Chamond / FR | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAVERNIER, Bernard 42500 Le Chambon Feugerolles / FR | 02 /
GUILLEMET, Frédéric 69300 CALUIRE ET CUIRE / FR | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Bringer IP 1, Place du Président Thomas Wilson 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22772503.3 | 01.09.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022EP74369 | Priority number, date | FR20210009152 | 01.09.2021 Original published format: FR 2109152 | [2024/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023031349 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4396472 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/08 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
F16G3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSPLATTE FÜR ZWEI ENDEN EINES FÖRDERBANDES MIT EINER HÜLSE, VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINER SOLCHEN VERBINDUNGSPLATTE UND ZUGEHÖRIGER STREIFEN VON VERBINDUNGSPLATTEN | [2024/28] | English: | PLATE FOR JOINING TWO END PORTIONS OF A CONVEYOR BELT, PROVIDED WITH A SHEATH, JOINING DEVICE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH JOINING PLATE, AND ASSOCIATED STRIP OF JOINING PLATES | [2024/28] | French: | PLAQUE DE JONCTION DE DEUX PORTIONS D'EXTREMITES DE BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE MUNIE D'UN FOURREAU, DISPOSITIF DE JONCTION COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE TELLE PLAQUE DE JONCTION ET BANDE DE PLAQUES DE JONCTION ASSOCIEE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP3189251 (ASER SARL [FR]); | [A]WO2020002378 (FP BUSINESS INVEST [FR]) | by applicant | EP0827575 | EP1163459 |