EP4399212 - SUBSTITUTED 2,3-DIHYDRO[1,3]THIAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINES, SALTS THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51371 Leverkusen / DE | [2024/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRACKENPOHL, Jens 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
BARBER, David Michael 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
BRAUN, Ralf 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
BROWN, Ronald Wilson 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
HEINEMANN, Ines 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 06 /
KALLUS, Christopher 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 07 /
DITTGEN, Jan 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 08 /
REINGRUBER, Anna Maria 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 09 /
BOLLENBACH-WAHL, Birgit 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 10 /
GATZWEILER, Elmar 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2024/29] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2024/29] | Application number, filing date | 22773192.4 | 02.09.2022 | [2024/29] | WO2022EP74486 | Priority number, date | EP20210195216 | 07.09.2021 Original published format: EP 21195216 | [2024/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023036707 | Date: | 16.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4399212 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/14, A01N43/78, A01N43/90, A01N55/08, A61P13/00, A61P21/00 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
C07D513/14 (EP);
A01N43/90 (EP);
A01N53/00 (EP);
A01N55/08 (EP);
A01P13/00 (EP);
A01P21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 2,3-DIHYDRO[1,3 THIAZOLO[4,5-B PYRIDINE, IHRE SALZE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE WIRKSTOFFE | [2024/29] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 2,3-DIHYDRO[1,3]THIAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINES, SALTS THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCES | [2024/29] | French: | 2,3-DIHYDRO[1,3]THIAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINES SUBSTITUÉES, LEURS SELS ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE SUBSTANCES ACTIVES HERBICIDES | [2024/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/29] | 08.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5931778 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA); | [AD]WO2016087373 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE2906507 | EP0030287 | EP0086750 | EP0094349 | DE3335514 | JPS6087254 | EP0174562 | EP0191736 | EP0268554 | EP0269806 | EP0333131 | EP0346620 | EP0365484 | WO9107874 | WO9108202 | US5123951 | EP0492366 | EP0582198 | WO9507897 | WO9745016 | US5723413 | WO9813361 | WO9827049 | WO9838856 | WO9900020 | WO9916744 | WO0234048 | WO03006470 | WO2004084631 | WO2005015994 | WO2005016001 | WO2005112630 | WO2006053166 | WO2007023719 | WO2007023764 | WO2008131861 | WO2008131860 | WO2009010260 | WO2010016846 | CN101838227 | EP2248421 | WO2010135524 | WO2012086848 | WO2012136751 | WO2013018928 | WO2014125651 | WO2015091584 | WO2015104688 | WO2015123133 | WO2016087373 | WO2016120403 | WO2017009806 | WO2017069275 | WO2017153601 | WO2018178947 | WO2018203235 | WO2019089580 | JP2019112369 | EP20010000946 |