EP4317450 - CARTILAGE EXTRACT WITH EFFECT OF IMPROVING IMMUNE RESPONSE, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anhui Semnl Biotechnology Co., Ltd No.26 Fengguan Road, Xiangshan District Huaibei, Anhui 235000 / CN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Haiyan Beijing 100062 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Aiqing Beijing 100062 / CN | 03 /
YAN, Zheng Beijing 100062 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Lige Beijing 100062 / CN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Impact Intellectual Property LLP 1 Sans Walk London EC1R 0LT / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22774286.3 | 23.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022CN82557 | Priority number, date | CN202110308583 | 23.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110308583 | [2024/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022199631 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317450 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/06, A23B4/20, C08B37/08, A61K38/17 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
A61P37/02 (EP,CN);
A61K35/32 (EP,CN,US);
A23L3/349 (EP);
A23L3/44 (EP);
A23L33/17 (EP);
A61K31/715 (CN);
A61K31/716 (EP);
A61K31/728 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/014 (CN);
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,CN);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (US);
C08L5/08 (EP);
C08L89/06 (EP);
C12N9/6408 (US);
C12N9/641 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/715, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/716, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/728, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K35/32, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | KNORPELEXTRAKT MIT WIRKUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER IMMUNREAKTION, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/06] | English: | CARTILAGE EXTRACT WITH EFFECT OF IMPROVING IMMUNE RESPONSE, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND USE THEREOF | [2024/06] | French: | EXTRAIT DE CARTILAGE AYANT POUR EFFET D'AMÉLIORER LA RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2023 | Translation filed | 20.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5856446 (WEINER HOWARD L [US], et al); | [A]JP2012176926 (SAWADA SHIGEMI); | [A]US2015119335 (DIJKSTRA PAUL [US], et al); | [A]US2016324146 (MOORE EUGENE R [US]); | [Y]CN106916870 (BEIJING SEMNL BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al); | [Y]CN110583756 (NINGDE XINGGUANG FOOD CO LTD); | by applicant | CN106916870 |