EP4265752 - STEEL SHEET AND WELDED JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yuya Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 22774820.9 | 18.02.2022 | [2023/43] | WO2022JP06706 | Priority number, date | JP20210051017 | 25.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021051017 | [2023/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022202020 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265752 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/00, C21D9/46, C22C38/00, C22C38/60, B32B15/01, C21D1/18, C21D8/02, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C22C38/16, C22C38/18, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/32 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/60 (US);
B23K11/11 (US);
B32B15/013 (EP);
C21D1/18 (US);
C21D1/185 (EP);
C21D1/84 (US);
C21D6/001 (US);
C21D6/002 (US);
C21D6/004 (US);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/007 (US);
C21D6/008 (US);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D8/021 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (US);
C21D8/0236 (US);
C21D8/0263 (US);
C21D8/0278 (US);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/001 (US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/005 (US);
C22C38/008 (US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/08 (EP,US);
C22C38/10 (US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP);
C22C38/20 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
C22C38/30 (US);
C22C38/32 (EP,US);
C22C38/34 (EP,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (KR);
C22C38/44 (KR,US);
C22C38/46 (KR,US);
C22C38/48 (KR,US);
C22C38/50 (KR,US);
C22C38/52 (US);
C22C38/54 (KR,US);
C23C2/06 (KR);
C23C2/285 (US);
C21D2211/001 (KR,US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/43] | C21D9/00, C21D9/46, C22C38/00, C22C38/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | STAHLBLECH UND SCHWEISSVERBINDUNG | [2023/43] | English: | STEEL SHEET AND WELDED JOINT | [2023/43] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER ET JOINT SOUDÉ | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2023 | Translation filed | 18.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009221519 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]EP3467134 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2004204344 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2004300452 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2009221519 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2009263686 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2019505693 (ARCELORMITTAL) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2019505691 (ARCELORMITTAL) [A] 1-5; | [PAX]WO2021261479 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-4[PX] 5 | by applicant | JPH11128688 | JP5305149B | JP2021051017 |