EP4282470 - TREATMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND PREVENTION OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES USING ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Awexome Ray, Inc. 303-2, 268, Hagui-ro Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 14056 / KR | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Keun Soo Seoul 05698 / KR | 02 /
GIHM, Se Hoon Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13636 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Hong Soo Seoul 05812 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Kang Pa Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37699 / KR | 05 /
BAEK, Su Ji Seoul 08340 / KR | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/48] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22776082.4 | 23.03.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022KR04049 | Priority number, date | KR20210037565 | 23.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210037565 | [2023/48] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022203382 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4282470 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A61N5/0613 (EP);
A61N5/1048 (US);
A61N5/0616 (US);
A61N5/10 (EP);
A61N5/1001 (EP);
A61N5/103 (US);
A61N5/1045 (US);
A61N2005/0661 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1022 (EP);
A61N2005/1074 (US);
A61N2005/1094 (EP,US);
A61N5/1049 (EP);
A61N5/1064 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG, UNTERDRÜCKUNG UND PRÄVENTION VON ENTZÜNDUNGSERKRANKUNGEN MIT ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN WELLEN | [2023/48] | English: | TREATMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND PREVENTION OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES USING ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES | [2023/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT ET MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT, DE SUPPRESSION ET DE PRÉVENTION DE MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES À L'AIDE D'ONDES ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2023 | Translation filed | 24.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003191459 (GANZ ROBERT A [US], et al); | [X]US2009163898 (GERTNER MICHAEL [US], et al); | [XI]US2010067658 (GERTNER MICHAEL [US], et al) | International search | [XY]KR20090080976 (ORAYA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [A]JP2012147866 (PANASONIC CORP); | [Y]KR20130082364 (NEXVIEWTX CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2015226576 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC, et al); | [A]KR20170081120 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) |