EP4315102 - DATABASE REPLICATION TO A REMOTE DEPLOYMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snowflake Inc. Suite 3A, 106 East Babcock Street Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHU, Pui Kei Johnston Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | 02 /
DAGEVILLE, Benoit Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | 03 /
DESAI, Shreyas Narendra Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | 04 /
DESHPANDE, Sameer Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | 05 /
MURALIDHAR, Subramanian Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | 06 /
WU, Di Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22776814.0 | 18.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US71217 | Priority number, date | US202163200668P | 21.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163200668 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022204660 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4315102 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/27, G06F16/21, H04L67/1095, H04L69/10 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G06F16/273 (EP,US);
G06F16/1844 (US);
G06F16/245 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | DATENBANKREPLIKATION FÜR EINEN FERNEINSATZ | [2024/06] | English: | DATABASE REPLICATION TO A REMOTE DEPLOYMENT | [2024/06] | French: | DUPLICATION DE BASE DE DONNÉES SUR UN DÉPLOIEMENT À DISTANCE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018068112 (SHARMA SHISHIR [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2005071195 (CASSEL DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US2007033154 (TRAINUM MICHAEL W [US], et al); | [A]US2011231831 (SMITH ANDREW [US], et al); | [A]US2018004829 (KATHURIA VISHAL [US], et al); | [A]US2020012659 (DAGEVILLE BENOIT [US], et al); | [A]US2020301943 (ROBINSON ERIC [US], et al); | [A]US2020342025 (BHARGAVA ANAND [IN], et al) |