EP4314488 - FIELD EQUIPMENT DATA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
GeoQuest Systems B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ The Hague / NL | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIDHAR, Garud London Greater London SW1E 6AJ / GB | 02 /
SUBBIAH, Surej Kumar Doha / QA | 03 /
IBRAHIM, Muhammad Doha / QA | 04 /
RODRIGUEZ HERRERA, Adrian Enrique Abingdon Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB | 05 /
ALHAMAD, Nasser Al Ahmadi, 61001 / KW | 06 /
GUPTA, Supriya Houston, Texas 77008 / US | 07 /
MOHAMAD HUSSEIN, Assef Abingdon Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB | 08 /
SANTHALINGAM, Vigneshwaran Houston, Texas 77056 / US | 09 /
SINHA, Rajeev Ranjan Houston, Texas 77056 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22776845.4 | 25.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US71353 | Priority number, date | US202163200756P | 26.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163200756 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022204723 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4314488 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/02, G01V1/46, G01V1/50, G06N3/04, G06N20/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
E21B43/00 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/0455 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06N3/088 (EP);
G01V1/46 (EP);
G01V1/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | DATENSYSTEM FÜR FELDAUSRÜSTUNG | [2024/06] | English: | FIELD EQUIPMENT DATA SYSTEM | [2024/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DONNÉES D'ÉQUIPEMENT DE TERRAIN | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009055098 (MESE ALI I [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0114]-[0148] and figures 8-9B *; | [A]US2014122035 (DEAN RICKY HOWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0067]-[0096] and figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2015241881 (IGE ADUNOLA [US], et al) [Y] 13-17 * paragraphs [0086], [0114]-[0120] and figure 9 *; | [A]US2020200000 (LANGNES TOMMY [GB], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0031]-[0192] and figures 1-11C *; | [XY]WO2020206403 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SYSTEMS USA INC [US]) [X] 1-12,18-20 * paragraphs [0011], [0037]-[0089] and figures 1-15 * [Y] 13-17 |