Designated contracting states | AL | | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | RS | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | | TR | | Validation states | KH | | MA | | MD | | TN | | Examination procedure | 04.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | | 14.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 14.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 03.03.2023 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE | | Event date: | 05.10.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: UNKNOWN | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Event date: | 03.07.2024 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20240314 | | Event date: | 03.07.2024 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 29.01.2025 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SAGE THERAPEUTICS, INC. | | Event date: | 14.02.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 40113303 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | |