EP4318204 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Xiong Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22778769.4 | 25.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022CN82971 | Priority number, date | CN202110343944 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110343944 | [2024/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022206586 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318204 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G06F1/16, G06F3/04845, G06F3/04886, G06F3/147, G06F9/451 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/147 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F1/1641 (EP,US);
G06F1/1652 (EP,US);
G06F1/1677 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F3/1446 (EP,US);
G06F3/1454 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | G06F3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/06] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2023 | Translation filed | 18.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2010060548 (CHOI KIL SOO [KR], et al); | [XAYI]US2015286288 (LEE DOYOUNG [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2019184947 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [XY]CN108475110 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]CN108563383 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XY]CN109842722 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]US10410400 (AKSIT DUYGU CEYLAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2020126519 (HEO JIYOON [KR], et al); | [Y]CN112333333 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN112965681 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD); | [PX]CN113741775 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) |