Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024027566 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110365571 | 02.04.2021 | CN202110975593 | 24.08.2021 | WO2022CN83189 | 25.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024514504 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110365571 | 02.04.2021 | CN202110975593 | 24.08.2021 | WO2022CN83189 | 25.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115175230 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110365571 | 02.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4301029 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110365571 | 02.04.2021 | CN202110975593 | 24.08.2021 | WO2022CN83189 | 25.03.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022206625 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110365571 | 02.04.2021 | CN202110975593 | 24.08.2021 |