EP4312489 - METHODS FOR MANAGING COORDINATED AUTONOMOUS TEAMS OF UNDER-CANOPY ROBOTIC SYSTEMS FOR AN AGRICULTURAL FIELD AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EARTHSENSE, INC. 60 Hazelwood Drive Champaign, Illinois 61820 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOWDHARY, Girish Champaign, Illinois 61822 / US | 02 /
SOMAN, Chinmay Urbana, Illinois 61801 / US | 03 /
HANSEN, Michael Champaign, Illinois 61821 / US | 04 /
BYRNES, Joseph Champaign, Illinois 61822 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22779231.4 | 17.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022IB52450 | Priority number, date | US202117219471 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: US202117219471 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022208220 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4312489 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01B79/00, A01B79/02 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
A01M21/00 (EP,US);
G05D1/0287 (US);
A01B69/001 (US);
A01B69/008 (US);
A01C21/00 (EP);
A01C7/00 (US);
A01M7/0089 (EP,US);
G01C21/3885 (EP,US);
G01S17/88 (EP);
G01S17/89 (US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0212 (US);
G05D1/227 (US);
G05D1/242 (EP);
G05D1/243 (EP);
G05D1/246 (EP);
G05D1/646 (US);
G05D1/6482 (EP);
G05D1/692 (US);
G05D1/6987 (EP);
G06Q50/02 (EP,US);
H04W4/024 (US);
H04W4/20 (US);
G05D2107/21 (EP);
G05D2109/18 (EP);
G05D2111/10 (EP);
G05D2111/17 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG KOORDINIERTER AUTONOMER TEAMS VON UNTERKANOPISCHEN ROBOTERSYSTEMEN FÜR EIN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES FELD UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2024/06] | English: | METHODS FOR MANAGING COORDINATED AUTONOMOUS TEAMS OF UNDER-CANOPY ROBOTIC SYSTEMS FOR AN AGRICULTURAL FIELD AND DEVICES | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION D'ÉQUIPES AUTONOMES COORDONNÉES DE SYSTÈMES ROBOTISÉS SOUS-CANOPÉE POUR UN CHAMP AGRICOLE ET DISPOSITIFS | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2016307448 (SALNIKOV VLADIMIR [RU], et al); | [Y]US2017223947 (GALL MICHAEL [US], et al) |