EP4317719 - BALL BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hironori Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 02 /
OYAMA, Takuya Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22779644.8 | 21.02.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP06892 | Priority number, date | JP20210062335 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021062335 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022209417 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317719 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/16, F16C33/38, F16C33/66 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
F16C19/163 (EP,US);
F16C33/3843 (US);
F16C33/3887 (EP);
F16C33/6651 (EP);
F16C2240/30 (EP);
F16C2240/34 (EP);
F16C2300/22 (EP);
F16C2314/00 (EP);
F16C2316/13 (EP);
F16C2360/24 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | F16C19/16, F16C33/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | KUGELLAGER | [2024/06] | English: | BALL BEARING | [2024/06] | French: | ROULEMENT À BILLES | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2023 | Translation filed | 10.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JPH0320723U ; | [A]JP2001140870 (NSK LTD); | [AY]JP2016118294 (NSK LTD); | [A]JP2021025613 (NSK LTD) | by applicant | JP2001140870 | JP2021062335 |