EP4318591 - LIGHT DETECTION DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation 4-14-1, Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAGAWA, Yoshihisa Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | 02 /
KAMESHIMA, Takatoshi Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22779796.6 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP09275 | Priority number, date | JP20210058329 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021058329 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022209571 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318591 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H01L27/1463 (EP);
G01N21/17 (US);
H01L27/12 (US);
H01L27/14636 (EP);
G01N2021/1765 (US);
H01L27/14605 (EP);
H01L27/14634 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | LICHTDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/06] | English: | LIGHT DETECTION DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE LUMIÈRE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2023 | Translation filed | 20.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002043502 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2006019455 (NEC ELECTRONICS CORP); | [Y]US2009085143 (PARK BYUNG-JUN [KR]); | [Y]JP2012033894 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2012064709 (SONY CORP); | [YX]JP2012084609 (SONY CORP); | [YX]JP2013251539 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2019068049 |