EP4318920 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR POWER CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZAOKA, Ryoya Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
SHINDO, Yusuke Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
KUBO, Shunichi Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
TOSHIYUKI, Ken Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22780015.8 | 11.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP11097 | Priority number, date | JP20210058794 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021058794 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022209794 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318920 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
B60L15/007 (EP,US);
H02M1/14 (US);
B60L58/12 (EP);
B60L58/16 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (US);
H02J7/0063 (EP);
H02M1/15 (EP);
H02M7/53871 (EP);
H02M7/5395 (US);
H02P21/05 (EP);
H02P21/22 (EP,US);
H02P27/08 (EP,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP);
B60L2240/423 (EP);
B60L2240/526 (EP);
B60L2240/545 (EP);
B60L2240/549 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LEISTUNGSUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/06] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR POWER CONVERSION DEVICE | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DESTINÉ À UN DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2023 | Translation filed | 15.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2010272395 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2011091952 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2011122835 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2011146183 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2011155788 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2014046830 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [A]JP2015149853 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2019165522 (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST) | by applicant | JP2021058794 |