EP4319408 - TERMINAL DEVICE, METHOD, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2024/06] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUBOI Hidekazu Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA Shohei Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
HORI Takako Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
INOUE Kyosuke Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22780448.1 | 24.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP13818 | Priority number, date | JP20210062887 | 01.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021062887 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022210234 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4319408 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W52/02 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0098 (EP);
H04W28/0278 (US);
H04W52/0235 (EP);
H04W52/0245 (EP);
H04W52/028 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG | [2024/06] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE, METHOD, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, PROCÉDÉ, ET CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2023 | Translation filed | 12.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2021062887 |