EP4317849 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South 1-13-1, Umeda, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Masaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 02 /
KUMAKURA, Eiji Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 03 /
IWATA, Ikuhiro Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 04 /
KAJI, Ryuhei Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIMI, Atsushi Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 06 /
UEDA, Hiroki Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 07 /
YAMADA, Takuro Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 08 /
NAKAYAMA, Masaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22781007.4 | 29.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP15713 | Priority number, date | JP20210062241 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021062241 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022210796 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317849 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00, F25B1/00, F25B49/02 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP);
F25B9/006 (US);
F25B49/00 (US);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B2600/0253 (EP);
F25B2600/2513 (EP);
F25B2600/2523 (EP);
F25B2700/00 (US);
F25B2700/19 (EP);
F25B2700/2108 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2024/06] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CYCLE DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2023 | Translation filed | 18.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62162853 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2002039648 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2004232951 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]EP3128257 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [X]US2019049155 (TANAKA KOSUKE [JP]) | International search | [YX]JPS62162853 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 4, 8-14 * specification, p. 3, lower right column, line 14 to p. 4, upper right column, line 17, fig. 1, 4 * [X] 1-3, 5-7; | [Y]JPH06337177 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 8-14* paragraphs [0032]-[0034], [0037], fig. 2-3 *; | [Y]JP2002039648 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 4, 8-14 * paragraph [0058] *; | [Y]JP2004232951 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 4, 8-14 * paragraph [0048] * | by applicant | JP2008281326 |