EP4318065 - FUSION SPLICING DEVICE AND CORE POSITION SPECIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Optifrontier Co., Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8589 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUWA Takahiro Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8589 / JP | 02 /
AKIYAMA Hiroki Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8589 / JP | 03 /
OOKI Kazuyoshi Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8589 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22781121.3 | 30.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP16087 | Priority number, date | JP20210061019 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021061019 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022210911 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318065 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/255 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G02B6/2551 (EP,KR);
G02B6/2553 (EP,KR);
G02B6/2555 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | SCHMELZSPLEISSVORRICHTUNG UND KERNPOSITIONSSPEZIFIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2024/06] | English: | FUSION SPLICING DEVICE AND CORE POSITION SPECIFICATION METHOD | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉPISSAGE PAR FUSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE SPÉCIFICATION DE POSITION DE COEUR | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2023 | Translation filed | 10.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003172680 (HUANG WEI-PING [SE], et al); | [A]JP2004506177 ; | [YX]US2006051043 (HUANG WEI-PING [SE], et al); | [A]JP2008519970 ; | [Y]JP2015224919 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | US2003164939 | US2006051043 | JP2008519970 | JP2021061019 |