EP4255116 - COOKING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Jiho Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Minjae Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22781353.2 | 13.01.2022 | [2023/40] | WO2022KR00688 | Priority number, date | KR20210042316 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210042316 | KR20210086299 | 01.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210086299 | [2023/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022211232 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255116 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/64, F24C15/02 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H05B6/6414 (EP,US);
H05B6/642 (EP,US);
F24C15/02 (EP);
H05B6/64 (EP);
H05B6/6426 (US);
H05B6/6482 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | KOCHGERÄT | [2023/40] | English: | COOKING APPARATUS | [2023/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2023 | Translation filed | 26.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20080037408 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0036]-[0056]; and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]KR20090104942 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 5,15 * See claim 1. *; | [A]KR20130011486 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0054]; and figures 5-6. *; | [XYA]KR20160015916 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,11-14 * See paragraphs [0002], [0051], [0053]-[0054], [0058], [0060], [0064]-[0065], [0068] and [0070]-[0072]; claim 1; and figures 2-6. * [Y] 2-5,8,10,15 [A] 6-7,9; | [Y]KR20190124584 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-5,8,10 * See paragraphs [0117] and [0131]; and figures 2, 4 and 7. * |