Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
05.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
13.12.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.10.2023 | Change - representative | |
25.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.10.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |