EP4313243 - A GUIDEWIRE CONTROLLER CASSETTE AND USING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XCATH, Inc. 9330 Kirby Drive Suite 900 Houston, Texas 77054 / US | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, Texas 78701 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Daniel H. Houston, Texas 77007 / US | 02 /
SHIN, Dong Suk Houston, Texas 77006 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22782132.9 | 30.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US22630 | Priority number, date | US202163169637P | 01.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163169637 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022212567 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4313243 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/09, A61M25/01 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
A61M25/09041 (EP,KR,US);
A61B34/30 (KR,US);
A61B34/35 (EP);
A61B2034/301 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2025/09183 (KR,US);
A61M2205/103 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSDRAHTSTEUERUNGSKASSETTE UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/06] | English: | A GUIDEWIRE CONTROLLER CASSETTE AND USING METHOD THEREOF | [2024/06] | French: | CASSETTE DE DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE FIL-GUIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012184955 (PIVOTTO LUIZ GERALDO [CH], et al); | [A]US2016354582 (YU ALAN L [US], et al); | [A]KR20170000178 (INDUSTRY-UNIV COOP FOUND HANYANG UNIV ERICA CAMPUS [KR]); | [A]US2017274181 (WENDEROW TAL [US], et al); | [A]KR20200000441 (XCATH INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US10342953 |