EP4314017 - CONJUGATED HEPCIDIN MIMETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protagonist Therapeutics, Inc. 7707 Gateway Boulevard Suite 140 Newark, California 94560 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHANDARI, Ashok Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Jie Salisbury, South Australia 4107 / AU | 03 /
BOURNE, Gregory Thomas Moggill, Queensland 4070 / AU | 04 /
SMYTHE, Mark Leslie Bardon, Queensland 4065 / AU | 05 /
TRAN, Tran Trung Newark, California 94560 / US | 06 /
TARANATH, Roopa Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22782206.1 | 31.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US22809 | Priority number, date | US202163169527P | 01.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163169527 P | US202163169533P | 01.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163169533 P | US202163169538P | 01.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163169538 P | US202263325323P | 30.03.2022 Original published format: US 202263325323 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022212696 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4314017 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/64, A61P3/02, C07K7/06, C07K7/50, C07K7/52, C07K7/54 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
C07K14/575 (EP);
A61K47/542 (EP);
A61K47/60 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
C07K7/02 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | KONJUGIERTE HEPCIDIN-MIMETIKA | [2024/06] | English: | CONJUGATED HEPCIDIN MIMETICS | [2024/06] | French: | MIMÉTIQUES D'HEPCIDINE CONJUGUÉS | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 07.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004152868 (LARSEN BJARNE DUE [DK], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5 * ; paragraphs [0027], [0119], [0147]-[0148], [0169], [0185] *; | [A]US2019002503 (BOURNE GREGORY THOMAS [AU], et al) [A] 1-3,5* ; entire publication. *; | [Y] - SIMMERLING, C et al., "Hydrophobic ''Collapse'' in a Cyclic Hexapeptide: Computer Simulations of CHDLFC and CAAAAC in Water", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19940301), vol. 116, doi:10.1021/ja00085a038, pages 2534 - 2547, XP055976277 [Y] 1-3,5 * ; abstract; page 2534, second column, second paragraph * |