EP4320143 - METHODS FOR INHIBITING RAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | For all designated states Revolution Medicines, Inc. 700 Saginaw Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORCORAN, Ryan B. Weston, Massachusetts 02493 / US | 02 /
NICHOLS, Robert J. Redwood City, California 94063 / US | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22782324.2 | 01.04.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022US23133 | Priority number, date | US202163170292P | 02.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163170292 P | US202163192843P | 25.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163192843 P | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022212894 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4320143 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K39/395, C12N15/113, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/50 (KR);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61K31/501 (EP,IL);
A61K31/517 (US);
A61K31/519 (KR,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,IL);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RAS-HEMMUNG | [2024/07] | English: | METHODS FOR INHIBITING RAS | [2024/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'INHIBITION DE RAS | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 09.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017158777 (KIM YONG-SUNG [KR], et al); |