EP4321467 - AUTOMATIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR PERSONNEL TRANSPORTATION DEVICE, AND PERSONNEL TRANSPORTATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Wei Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 02 /
JUURIOKSA, Martti Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Zhong Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 04 /
BELOV, Mika Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 05 /
PIIRONEN, Mikko Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22783990.9 | 02.04.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022CN85042 | Priority number, date | CN202110366823 | 06.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110366823 | [2024/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022213924 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321467 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B66B29/00, B66B5/00 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
B66B29/005 (EP,CN);
B66B29/00 (CN);
B66B5/0012 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/07] | B66B29/00, B66B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR PERSONENTRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG UND PERSONENTRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG | [2024/07] | English: | AUTOMATIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR PERSONNEL TRANSPORTATION DEVICE, AND PERSONNEL TRANSPORTATION DEVICE | [2024/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE POUR DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE PERSONNEL, ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE PERSONNEL | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2023 | Translation filed | 02.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003118967 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES); | [XY]CN101695983 (UNIV ZHEJIANG TECHNOLOGY); | [A]CN105438953 (XING QILIANG); | [Y]CN106698171 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR KK); | [A]CN107662873 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO); | [A]CN107686043 (HITACHI LTD); | [PX]CN112919296 (KONE ELEVATORS CO LTD, et al); | [PX]CN215592314U (KONE ELEVATORS CO LTD, et al) |