EP4319737 - BIOACTIVE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tets, Victor 45 East 89th Street, Apt 10A New York, NY 10128 / US | For all designated states Tets, Georgy 45 East 89th Street, Apt 10A New York, NY 10128 / US | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/07] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 22784245.7 | 05.04.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022IB53167 | Priority number, date | US202163170822P | 05.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163170822 P | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022214963 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4319737 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/315 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/155 (US);
A01N43/54 (US);
A01N43/82 (US);
A01N47/28 (US);
A01N47/44 (EP,US);
A01N59/16 (US);
A01N63/50 (US);
A01P1/00 (EP);
A01P21/00 (EP,US);
A01P3/00 (EP,US);
A23K20/105 (EP);
A23K20/111 (EP);
A23K20/189 (EP);
A23K20/26 (EP);
A23K20/30 (EP);
A23K50/80 (EP);
A61K31/047 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K31/728 (EP);
A61K31/785 (EP);
A61K33/30 (EP,US);
A61K33/42 (EP);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/183 (US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K47/32 (EP);
A61K47/36 (US);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/0063 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP,US);
A61P11/02 (US);
A61P13/10 (US);
A61P17/00 (US);
A61P17/02 (US);
A61P17/06 (US);
A61P17/08 (US);
A61P27/02 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/10 (EP,US);
A61P31/22 (US);
C02F1/50 (US);
| C-Set: |
A01N47/44, A01N31/02, A01N59/16, A01N43/16, A01N59/14, A01N59/26, A01N37/44 (EP);
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/728, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/785, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/30, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | BIOAKTIVE PRODUKTE | [2024/07] | English: | BIOACTIVE PRODUCTS | [2024/07] | French: | PRODUITS BIOACTIFS | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 22.05.2024 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 12.06.2024 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011269936 (TETS VIKTOR VENIAMINOVICH [RU], et al); | [A]US2017013838 (ASHKINAZI RIMMA ILINICHNA [RU]); | [A]US2020113932 (TETS VIKTOR VENIAMINOVICH [US], et al); |