Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4320686 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP22785316 JP2023561316 KR20237035017 US2022023515W US202217713042



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20230165257Global Dossier 05.12.2023A
Priority number Date
US202163170994 05.04.2021
WO2022US23515 05.04.2022
US202217713042 04.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024513243Global Dossier 22.03.2024A
Priority number Date
US202163170994 05.04.2021
WO2022US23515 05.04.2022
US202217713042 04.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4320686Global Dossier 12.02.2025A4
EP4320686 14.02.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202163170994 05.04.2021
WO2022US23515 05.04.2022
US202217713042 04.04.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022216730Global Dossier 13.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202163170994 05.04.2021
US202217713042 04.04.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US12040550Global Dossier 16.07.2024B2
US2022320753 06.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202163170994 05.04.2021
US202217713042 04.04.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW202308230 16.02.2023A
Priority number Date
US202163170994 05.04.2021
US202217713042 04.04.2022