Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4320429 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4320429



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(21)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 228
25.03.2025 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
25.03.2025 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.03.2025 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
25.03.2025 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results Search / examination 6
28.02.2025 Search started Search / examination 1
19.11.2024 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.11.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.11.2024 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 20
26.04.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.01.2024 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.11.2023 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
23.10.2023 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
04.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.10.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.10.2023 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
18.08.2023 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
31.10.2022 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
31.10.2022 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
31.10.2022 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 67
13.10.2022 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
13.10.2022 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 28