EP4370381 - PACKAGING SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE BUILT OF USABLE COMPONENTS COMPLEMENTING THE FUNCTIONALITY OF THE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2024/21] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE PACKAGING SYSTEM BUILT OF USABLE COMPONENTS COMPLEMENTING THE FUNCTIONALITY OF THE DEVICE | ||
[2024/41] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ilchev, Petyo 21 Bogdan Str. Ap.35 1505 Sofia / BG | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Benatov, Samuil Gabriel Dr. EMIL BENATOV & PARTNERS 6, Asen Peykov Str. 1113 Sofia / BG | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22785787.7 | 01.09.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022IB58223 | Priority number, date | BG20210005374 | 03.09.2021 Original published format: BG 537421 | [2024/21] | Filing language | BG | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023031851 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4370381 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/00, // H04M1/04 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
B65D15/02 (EP);
B65D2585/6835 (EP);
H04M1/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/21] | B60R11/02, H04M1/02, B65D8/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT, BESTEHEND AUS VERWENDBAREN KOMPONENTEN, DIE DIE FUNKTIONALITÄT DES GERÄTS ERGÄNZEN | [2024/41] | English: | PACKAGING SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE BUILT OF USABLE COMPONENTS COMPLEMENTING THE FUNCTIONALITY OF THE DEVICE | [2024/41] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EMBALLAGE POUR UN APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE CONSTITUÉ DE COMPOSANTS UTILISABLES COMPLÉTANT LA FONCTIONNALITÉ DE L'APPAREIL | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/21] | VERPACKUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, DAS AUS NUTZBAREN KOMPONENTEN BESTEHT, DIE DIE FUNKTIONALITÄT DER VORRICHTUNG ERGÄNZEN | ||
Former [2024/21] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE PACKAGING SYSTEM BUILT OF USABLE COMPONENTS COMPLEMENTING THE FUNCTIONALITY OF THE DEVICE | ||
Former [2024/21] | SYSTÈME D'EMBALLAGE DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE CONSTRUIT À PARTIR DE COMPOSANTS UTILISABLES COMPLÉTANT LA FONCTIONNALITÉ DU DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 15.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20120072296 (LEE CHUL JAE [KR]); | [A]WO2013166326 (SCHREMS PAUL [US], et al); | [A]WO2017201500 (EVOLVED AUDIO LLC [US]); | [XP]BG4141U (ILCHEV PETYO [BG]) |