EP4325923 - TERMINAL, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22788034.1 | 29.03.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022JP15531 | Priority number, date | JP20210069906 | 16.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021069906 | [2024/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022220109 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325923 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/28, H04W72/04 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04W72/232 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04B7/06952 (EP);
H04L5/0023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT, DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND BASISSTATION | [2024/08] | English: | TERMINAL, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND BASE STATION | [2024/08] | French: | TERMINAL, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET STATION DE BASE | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2023 | Translation filed | 02.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2021069906 |