EP4324641 - TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE PIEZOELECTRIC LAMINATED FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kureha Corporation 3-3-2, Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAJI Makoto Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22788069.7 | 30.03.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022JP16326 | Priority number, date | JP20210069038 | 15.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021069038 | [2024/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022220144 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4324641 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H10N30/30, H10N30/857, H10N30/88, H10N30/87, H10N30/06 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
H10N30/878 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,KR);
B32B7/025 (EP);
B32B9/00 (EP);
C08J7/042 (EP,KR);
H10N30/06 (EP,KR,US);
H10N30/30 (KR);
H10N30/857 (EP,KR,US);
H10N30/87 (KR);
H10N30/883 (US);
C08J2327/14 (EP);
G06F2203/04105 (US);
G06F3/041 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/08] | B32B9/00, H01L41/047, H01L41/113, H01L41/193, H01L41/29, B32B7/025 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTER LEITFÄHIGER PIEZOELEKTRISCHER LAMINIERTER FILM | [2024/08] | English: | TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE PIEZOELECTRIC LAMINATED FILM | [2024/08] | French: | FILM STRATIFIÉ PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE CONDUCTEUR TRANSPARENT | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2023 | Translation filed | 04.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014185530 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [YX]WO2015064328 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2015129829 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2019102635 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPH05324203 |