Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4324641
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.09.2024 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
13.09.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
13.09.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
20.06.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
20.06.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2024 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
19.01.2024 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
26.12.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
09.10.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
04.10.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|