EP4323514 - NON-VIRAL HOMOLOGY MEDIATED END JOINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arsenal Biosciences, Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, Aaron South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
HSU, Pei-Ken South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
MOOT, Robert South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
TRUONG, Annie South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
GARDNER, Thomas South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 06 /
HSU, Brian South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22788895.5 | 13.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022US24703 | Priority number, date | US202163174468P | 13.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163174468 P | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022221467 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4323514 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12N15/113, C12N15/87, A61K48/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/907 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/113 (KR);
C12N15/62 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N9/1276 (EP,IL);
C12N9/93 (EP,IL);
C12Y207/07049 (EP,IL);
C07K2319/00 (EP,IL);
C07K2319/09 (KR);
C07K2319/80 (EP,IL);
C07K2319/81 (KR);
C12N2310/20 (US);
C12N2510/00 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | NICHTVIRALE HOMOLOGIEVERMITTELTE ENDVERBINDUNG | [2024/08] | English: | NON-VIRAL HOMOLOGY MEDIATED END JOINING | [2024/08] | French: | JONCTION D'EXTRÉMITÉ MÉDIÉE PAR UNE HOMOLOGIE NON VIRALE | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 25.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017004509 (GHOROGHCHIAN P PETER [US], et al); | [X]WO2020123871 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); |