EP4228209 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.07.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Qulian Technology Co., Ltd. Room 2001, Building A, Building 2 No. 399, Danfeng Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310012 / CN | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHANG, Xuan Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 02 /
HU, Maifang Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 03 /
TAO, Yuan Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Fanglei Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Kejie Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 22789151.2 | 11.08.2022 | [2023/33] | WO2022CN111762 | Priority number, date | CN202111599322 | 24.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111599322 | [2023/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023115982 | Date: | 29.06.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228209 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.06.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04W8/26, H04W76/10, H04L9/00 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/0281 (CN);
H04L67/141 (US);
H04L63/20 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP);
G06F16/27 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/33] | H04L9/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/33] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2022 | Translation filed | 24.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006227769 (VEITS OLIVER [DE]); | [A]US2020154339 (SINGH SHOBHIT KUMAR [IN], et al); | [XI]US2021075590 (YANG FEI [CN], et al) |