Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4223088
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.07.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
24.07.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.06.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
31.05.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
18.07.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.07.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
07.07.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
07.07.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
26.06.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2023 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
08.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.05.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
05.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|