Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116830816 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76226 | 21.09.2022 | DE102021131953 | 03.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3206473 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76226 | 21.09.2022 | DE102021131953 | 03.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022400984 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76226 | 21.09.2022 | DE102021131953 | 03.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4223088 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2024 | B1 | EP4223088 | 09.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76226 | 21.09.2022 | DE102021131953 | 03.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023007217 | 26.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76226 | 21.09.2022 | DE102021131953 | 03.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023099056 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021131953 | 03.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021131953 | 17.05.2023 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102021131953 | 03.12.2021 |